DE HB189 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

The Advanced Wireless Infrastructure Investment Act creates a new Chapter 16 of Title 17 that will accelerate investment in mobile broadband infrastructure and ready the State for the next wave of economic development in the digital economy. In recognition of the shift from landline to wireless communications, the Act authorizes wireless providers access to the States rights of way and establishes a Statewide policy for deployment of small wireless cells to meet the growing demand for wireless services which provide Delaware citizens with access to advanced technology, information and 911 services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 17 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Highways.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-31 Signed by Governor
2017-06-15 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2017-06-09 Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate
2017-06-08 Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT
2017-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 5 Favorable
2017-05-18 Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback