DE HB189 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This act increases the maximum administrative assessment which may be imposed for red light camera violations from $75.00 to $110.00.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Rules Of The Road.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Rep. James Johnson [D] | Sen. Robert Marshall [D] |
Rep. John Mitchell [D] | Rep. Hazel Plant [D] | Rep. Peter Schwartzkopf [D] | Rep. Darryl Scott [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-09 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 4 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-12 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-04-20 | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate | |
2010-04-01 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-04-01 | Necessary Rules are Suspended in House | |
2009-06-17 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2009-06-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |