DE HB187 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

With the implementation of land banks in the State of Delaware, an increasing number of vacant and abandoned properties will be brought to sheriffs sales. Many of these parcels will be dilapidated and require investment to render the house habitable. Blight will only be ameliorated if the bidders upon such property acquire it intending to invest in the property, thereby improving the housing in the neighborhood and eliminating blight. If bidders at a tax lien sale have failed to pay taxes when due and have failed to maintain the condition of other real property they own in the same jurisdiction, it is not likely that they intend to invest in and improve the condition of additional property they acquire. Instead they are speculating on a turnaround in the neighborhood based upon the investment and efforts of others.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Titles 9 And 22 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Sheriff's Sales.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-07 Signed by Governor
2017-06-30 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-06-28 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-23 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-06-22 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-22 Amendment HA 2 to HB 187 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-22 Amendment HA 1 to HB 187 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-21 Amendment HA 2 to HB 187 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Community Affairs) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-06-13 Amendment HA 1 to HB 187 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-18 Introduced and Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback