DE HB187 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill adjusts the criminal background check and review period for taxi and limousine drivers to equal what is expected of a driver for a Transportation Network Company such as Uber or Lyft.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Taxicab And Limousine License.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HIGHWAYS & TRANSPORTATION) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Assigned to Highways & Transportation Committee in Senate |
2015-06-23 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 9 On Its Merits |
2015-06-16 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |