DE HB186 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act makes the Board member terms of appointment equal in length to each other by eliminating language pertaining to when a Board member is appointed to fill a vacant seat. This Act also changes the Board meeting requirement from at least once per quarter to at least once per calendar year. The ability to meet more frequently remains intact.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Board Of Podiatry.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Lambert [D] | Sen. Kyle Gay [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-22 | Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-22 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-18 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-05-13 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |