DE HB186 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-14 - Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 8 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-14 - Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 8 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Currently, all school districts, including vocational schools, are subject to the Auditor of Accounts. Edits to the November 2010 Charter School Manual removed instructions for charter schools to go through Auditor of Accounts when contracting for audits. There is presently no legislative authority to require charter schools to submit to the Auditor of Accounts processes. This bill adds charter schools to the list of entities for audits through the Auditor of Accounts. The bill takes effect so that the Auditor of Accounts shall conduct postaudits for the time periods starting on or after July 1, 2015.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 14 And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Oversight Of Charter Schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 8 On Its Merits |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |
2015-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 23 YES 17 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-30 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Stricken |
2015-06-30 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-06-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 3 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits |
2015-06-16 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |