DE HB185 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act establishes certain enumerated regulations on automated telephone calls, often referred to as “robo calls”.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Automated Calls In The State Of Delaware.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-13 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-05 | Reported Out of Committee (ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES/ELECTIONS) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-01-12 | Assigned to Administrative Services/Elections Committee in Senate | |
2009-06-24 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2009-06-03 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2009-05-28 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |