DE HB183 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act extends the existence of the Water Supply Coordinating Council from January 1, 2016, to January 1, 2022.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 26 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Public Utilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Sen. David McBride [D] | Rep. Joseph Miro [R] | Rep. Michael Mulrooney [D] |
Rep. John Viola [D] | Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Assigned to Energy & Transit Committee in Senate |
2015-06-18 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-18 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-06-18 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-06-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 5 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2015-06-16 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |