DE HB182 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on October 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on October 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The Victims Compensation Assistance Program (Agency or VCAP) administers the Victims Compensation Fund and provides financial assistance to eligible victims of crimes to help cover the costs of a variety of services that help victims and their families begin to rebuild their lives, including lost wages, medical expenses, payment for mental health counseling, and funeral expenses. By awarding financial compensation for losses that victims sustain as a result of crime, VCAP can help alleviate the financial burden and distress that crime leaves behind. In FY 2019, VCAP paid $2,091,787.94 to and on behalf of victims of crime. VCAP is solvent and the Victims Compensation Fund balance as of June 30, 2020 was $4,155,111.82.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Victims Of Crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-20 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-17 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-17 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-17 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 182 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2021-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2021-05-20 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 182 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-05-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |