DE HB182 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on August 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill clarifies that the reviews of child abuse and neglect deaths and near deaths are confidential and should not be used in any proceedings. It ensures that the committees and panels who do the work on behalf of the Child Protection Accountability Commission are protected. Finally, the bill clarifies that any duties of the State for public disclosure in these cases under the federal Child Abuse Prevention and Treatment Act will not be fulfilled by these confidential reviews conducted by the Commission as Delawares Citizen Review Panel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Titles 16 And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Responses To Child Abuse And Neglect.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-30 Signed by Governor
2017-06-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-15 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-06-15 Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT
2017-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 2 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
2017-05-16 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback