DE HB181 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on August 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act makes updates to how reports of child abuse and neglect are handled by the various members of the multidisciplinary team. The Act codifies the multidisciplinary team and case. The Act adds additional duties to the Investigation Coordinator, law enforcement, the Department of Justice and the Division of Family Services that are current best practices but not required by law. The Act reorganizes the section pertaining to the Division of Family Services to reflect current best practices. The Act allows nurse practitioners to take emergency protective custody.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Responses To Child Abuse And Neglect.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-30 Signed by Governor
2017-06-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NOT VOTING
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-13 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-06-13 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
2017-05-16 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback