DE HB181 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill adds support proceedings to the Family Court proceedings in which mediation is prohibited. This applies to cases in which one of the parties has been found by a court to have committed an act of domestic violence against the other party or if either party has been ordered to stay away or have no contact with the other party, unless a victim of domestic violence who is represented by counsel requests such mediation.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Child Protection From Domestic Violence And Sex Offenders Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Barbieri [D] | Sen. Patricia Blevins [D] | Rep. Deborah Hudson [R] | Rep. Earl Jaques [D] |
Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Rep. John Kowalko [D] | Rep. Kimberly Williams [D] | Sen. Catherine Cloutier [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |
2014-01-14 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-12 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 7 On Its Merits |
2013-06-06 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |