DE HB180 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act authorizes the Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control to manage the eel fishery by regulation in order to adopt limits and sizes that are consistent with the Interstate Fishery Management Plan for American Eel (“Plan”). At present, Delaware’s eel fishing laws are not in compliance with the Plan and Delaware is likely to be subject to enforcement action from the Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Commission.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Eel Fishing.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Sen. David McBride [D] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Rep. William Carson [D] |
Rep. Ronald Gray [R] | Sen. Brian Pettyjohn [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate |
2016-01-14 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 36 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 5 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-01-14 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-01-14 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-01-14 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2016-01-13 | House | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 9 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits |
2016-01-12 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-06-16 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |