DE HB18 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 19 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2016-12-15 - Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill clarifies the General Assemblys intent last session in amending the states habitual offender law, specifically (a) that the changes made by the General Assembly were intended to affect minimum mandatory sentences, not sentences where judges had already exercised complete discretion, (b) that the changes were not designed to reduce minimum mandatory sentences associated in the Delaware Code with specific crimes (e.g. illegal gun possession), and (c) allows the sentencing judge to impose probation after the minimum mandatory sentence required by this section.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Habitual Criminals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House of Representatives - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-15 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
2017-01-18 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 6 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2017-01-19 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-01-19 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-03-16 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2017-03-21 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback