DE HB179 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-01 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-01 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act permits State employees who are employed by the Delaware State Police or Delaware Capitol Police and work in a variety of job titles, all of which are more commonly referred to as "9-1-1 operators," to retire at 25 years without any reduction. Those employees will pay a higher employee contribution rate than other State employees.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The State Employees' Pension Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-28 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2018-03-27 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-03-27 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-01-04 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-28 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 179, and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |