DE HB178 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

The children of parents who divorce or were never married often share a surname with only one parent, which may lead to confusion or hardship when schools, doctors, or others fail to recognize the childs connection with the parent with whom the child does not share a similar surname. Parents and children in such circumstances have compelling reason to seek to add a second surname to the childs name.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Minors' Petitions For Name Change.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-30 Signed by Governor
2017-07-02 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-29 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-29 Amendment HA 1 to HB 178 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 4 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2017-06-06 Amendment HA 1 to HB 178 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-16 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback