DE HB176 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill gives local school boards or charter school boards more discretion on a case by case basis to suspend students for the possession of a deadly weapon other than a firearm in a Safe School or Recreation Zone. This bill is the result of a case in the Brandywine School District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Possession Of A Weapon In A Safe School And Recreation Zone.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-29 Signed by Governor
2017-07-02 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-07-02 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NOT VOTING
2017-07-02 Amendment HA 2 to HB 176 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-07-02 Amendment HA 1 to HB 176 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-29 Amendment HA 2 to HB 176 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-06-01 Amendment HA 1 to HB 176 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-16 Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback