DE HB176 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill gives local school boards or charter school boards more discretion on a case by case basis to suspend students for the possession of a deadly weapon other than a firearm in a Safe School or Recreation Zone. This bill is the result of a case in the Brandywine School District.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Possession Of A Weapon In A Safe School And Recreation Zone.
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Hudson [R] | Sen. Gregory Lavelle [R] | Rep. James Johnson [D] | Rep. Helene Keeley [D] |
Rep. Kimberly Williams [D] | Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-07-02 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-07-02 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NOT VOTING | |
2017-07-02 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 176 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2017-07-02 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 176 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2017-06-29 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 176 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-01 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 176 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-05-16 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |