DE HB175 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act allows any qualified voter evidencing a desire to vote by mail in writing to the State Elections Commission to vote by mail in primary, general, and special federal elections. The State Elections Commission shall administer the program, creating rules and regulations that allow processing and scanning of mail ballots ahead of Election Day without tabulation until Election Day, dropping off mail ballots at any polling place on Election Day and dropping off mail ballots in a secure drop box of each county Department of Elections office before and leading up to Election Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Voting By Mail.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2019-06-12 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2019-06-05 Amendment HA 1 to HB 175 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-05-30 Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback