DE HB174 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
This Act strikes the sections of existing law pertaining to merged instruction and apprenticeship programs for cosmetologists and barbers because no schools have applied for approval to conduct merged programs. This Act authorizes transfer of apprentice hours to cosmetology and barbering programs which will accomplish the same purpose as merged programs which are being eliminated. This Act also makes technical changes to existing law to conform to the Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Relating To The Board Of Cosmetology And Barbering And Licensure Of Aestheticians.
Sponsors
Rep. Sherae'a Moore [D] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Sen. Kyle Gay [D] |
Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Sen. Jack Walsh [D] | Rep. Eric Morrison [D] | Rep. Madinah Wilson-Anton [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-08 | Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-08 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-05-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2021-05-06 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |