DE HB174 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act raises the first offense of purchasing or obtaining a firearm for someone not legally qualified to own, possess or purchase one from a Class F to a Class E Felony. This change is to deter such "straw purchases" by making jail time more likely for the offender, and consequently, to reduce the number of people who cannot legally possess firearms but obtain them in this manner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Relating To Illegal Purchases Of Firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Signed by Governor
2018-03-15 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-03-14 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2018-03-09 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-03-08 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2017-05-16 Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback