DE HB173 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill further consolidates animal welfare law enforcement roles and responsibilities under Title 16. The Office of Animal Welfare enforces all animal control and animal cruelty laws of this state. Upon the transfer of such responsibilities to the Office of Animal Welfare, officers were given greater enforcement authority than previously assigned under the Delaware State Constable Board. As such, animal welfare officers were removed from the Boards oversight and the additional laws enforced previously as constables need to be added to the section of the code that defines officer authority, specifically when enforcing animal fighting laws and laws pertaining to dangerous animals. Other laws, like the dog control law, needed to be brought up to date with current Office of Animal Welfare authority. Additionally, the bill updates the Dangerous Dog Law to allow for more thorough investigation prior to civil filings, adds code provisions concerning dogs that repeatedly attack or threaten to attack people and animals in the community, creates steps for ensuring compliance to court rulings, and establishes a deadline for filing appeals after dangerous dog (with euthanasia) rulings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11, 16 And 29 Of The Delaware Code Related To Dangerous Animals And Animal Welfare Laws.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21 Signed by Governor
2017-07-01 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 5 NO 3 ABSENT
2017-07-01 Amendment SA 1 to HS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT
2017-06-30 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-23 Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
2017-06-22 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NOT VOTING
2017-06-22 Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-22 Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2017-06-06 Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 173, and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback