DE HB173 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill further consolidates animal welfare law enforcement roles and responsibilities under Title 16. The Office of Animal Welfare enforces all animal control and animal cruelty laws of this state. Upon the transfer of such responsibilities to the Office of Animal Welfare, officers were given greater enforcement authority than previously assigned under the Delaware State Constable Board. As such, animal welfare officers were removed from the Boards oversight and the additional laws enforced previously as constables need to be added to the section of the code that defines officer authority, specifically when enforcing animal fighting laws and laws pertaining to dangerous animals. Other laws, like the dog control law, needed to be brought up to date with current Office of Animal Welfare authority. Additionally, the bill updates the Dangerous Dog Law to allow for more thorough investigation prior to civil filings, adds code provisions concerning dogs that repeatedly attack or threaten to attack people and animals in the community, creates steps for ensuring compliance to court rulings, and establishes a deadline for filing appeals after dangerous dog (with euthanasia) rulings.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11, 16 And 29 Of The Delaware Code Related To Dangerous Animals And Animal Welfare Laws.
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Jaques [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Sen. Robert Marshall [D] | Rep. John Viola [D] |
Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-07-01 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-07-01 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 5 NO 3 ABSENT | |
2017-07-01 | Amendment SA 1 to HS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT | |
2017-06-30 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-23 | Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2017-06-22 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NOT VOTING | |
2017-06-22 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2017-06-22 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-06 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 173, and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |