DE HB172 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

This Bill limits a health insurers right to overpayment recovery to two years from the date of the original payment. The time limit does not apply where there is fraud or other intentional misconduct, when overpayment recovery is initiated by a self-insured plan, or where required by a federal or state plan. The bill also requires 30 days notice to healthcare providers regarding an attempt to recover overpayment as well as requiring insurers to have policies and procedures allowing challenge to the alleged overpayment. This bill affects all lines of health insurance including both individual and group policies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Health Insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16 Signed by Governor
2018-01-24 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-01-17 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-07-12 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2017-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-06-30 Amendment HA 2 to HB 172 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-30 Amendment HA 1 to HB 172 - Stricken in House
2017-06-28 Amendment HA 2 to HB 172 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 10 On Its Merits
2017-05-17 Amendment HA 1 to HB 172 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-11 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback