DE HB170 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act allows counties to use Realty Transfer Tax funds to pay expenses related to assessments and reassessments of real property and associated improvements. Further, it permits New Castle County to expand potential referees of tax assessment appeals beyond members of the Bar of the State of Delaware.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 9 Of The Delaware Code Relating To County Taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-24 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NO | |
2021-05-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2021-05-13 | Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2021-05-13 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2021-05-07 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-04-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2021-04-20 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |