DE HB170 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

This legislation, the Angel Investor Job Creation and Innovation Act for Small Technology Companies, creates an incentive for qualified angel investors to invest capital in qualified Delaware small technology companies..

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Titles 29 And 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Angel Investor Job Creation And Innovation Act .

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24 Signed by Governor
2018-05-01 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 NO
2018-04-25 Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 7 NO
2018-04-25 Amendment SA 1 to HB 170 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NOT VOTING
2018-04-25 Amendment SA 1 to SA 1 to HB 170 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NOT VOTING
2018-04-25 Amendment SA 1 to SA 1 to HB 170 - Introduced and Placed with Bill
2018-04-25 Amendment SA 1 to HB 170 - Reconsidered by Senate
2018-04-25 Lifted From Table in Senate
2018-04-25 Laid On Table in Senate
2018-04-25 Lifted From Table in Senate
2018-04-24 Laid On Table in Senate
2018-04-24 Amendment SA 1 to HB 170 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NO
2018-04-19 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-04-18 Amendment SA 1 to HB 170 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-07-12 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2017-07-02 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-08 Amendment HA 1 to HB 170 - Stricken in House
2017-06-08 Amendment HA 1 to HB 170 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2017-05-10 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback