DE HB168 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would allow insurance companies to invest in mortgages on long-term leaseholds in the jurisdictions approved by the Department of Insurance. It is the intent of the Department of Insurance that the first approved jurisdiction be the United Kingdom. In the United Kingdom real estate typically is held not in fee simple (like the US) but long-term land leases. Thirty three other states including Maryland, New Jersey, and New York have similar statues.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance Investments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-05-11 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-03-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-03-17 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2022-03-17 | Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT | |
2022-01-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-29 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 168, and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |