DE HB168 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-18 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-18 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act increases the burial benefit upon the death of an individual receiving a pension under the State Employees Pension plan from $7,000 to $8,000.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Benefits In The State Employees' Pension Plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2019-06-17 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 168 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-30 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |