DE HB167 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The National Highway Traffic Safety Administration (NHTSA) has issued a final rule for odometer disclosure. NHTSAs final rule became effective January 1, 2021. The new rule extends the age of vehicles exempt from odometer disclosure from 10 years old to 20 years old phasing the exemptions in by adding one year at a time for model year 2011 and newer vehicles. For example, a model year 2010 vehicle would be exempt starting in 2020; model year 2011 and newer vehicles would be exempt starting in 2031. This Act makes Delaware law consistent with the new federal rule. The Act also makes certain technical corrections to make the current law consistent with the Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Motor Vehicle Odometers.
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Osienski [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Lockman [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Sen. Ernesto Lopez [R] |
Sen. Jack Walsh [D] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Rep. John Mitchell [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-22 | Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-22 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-18 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2021-04-29 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |