DE HB167 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Cooking wine contains alcohol but has been exempted from alcohol regulation by the federal government (Alcohol and Tobacco Tax and Trade Bureau) and many states as long as it contains no more than 20% alcohol by volume and no less than 1.5% salt, thereby making it unfit for beverage consumption. This Act adds cooking wine to the list of exempted liquids from the alcohol regulation. This Act provides that DATE may investigate allegations of misuse of ยง 725 of this title and refer the matter to the Commissioner for a hearing if the manufacturer or seller disagrees with DATEs determination.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating The Sale Of Cooking Wine And Alcoholic Liquors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-06-08 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2017-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-05-17 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2017-05-16 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-05-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2017-05-09 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |