DE HB166 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill changes the times when the sale of alcoholic liquor for off-premises consumption may occur on Sundays to be from 10:00 a.m. to 8:00 p.m.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Alcoholic Liquors.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] | Rep. Joseph Miro [R] | Rep. Bryon Short [D] |
Rep. Jeffrey Spiegelman [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 NO | |
2017-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-15 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2017-06-15 | Passed By House. Votes: 28 YES 8 NO 5 ABSENT | |
2017-05-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |
2017-05-09 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |