DE HB166 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow injured workers who seek medical care from out-of-state, non-certified health care providers, in the payment of their medical expenses. This revision will correct a flaw in the current statute that was exposed by the Delaware Supreme Court in the case of Wyatt v. Rescare Home Care, 81 A. 3d 1253 (Del. 2013) and Vanvliet v. D&B Transportation, 105 A.3d 390 (Del. 2014.). This bill removes the certification requirement for health care providers who are not licensed in Delaware, but licensed in another state; changes the allowable payment for these non-certified, out-of-state providers to the lesser of the usual and customary, the other state’s maximum reimbursement, Delaware’s maximum reimbursement, or a negotiated contract; and adds utilization review as a payer recourse for non-certified, out-of-state providers. This bill also allows the Workers’ Compensation Oversight Panel to realize the 2016 and 2017 mandated medical cost savings in the Delaware workers’ compensation system through any component of the health care payment system and not just the fee schedule. This bill also allows the Workers’ Compensation Oversight Panel to create regulations pertaining to the use of electronic billing in the workers’ compensation healthcare payment system.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Workers’ Compensation.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryon Short [D] | Sen. Patricia Blevins [D] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] |
Rep. Michael Mulrooney [D] | Rep. Edward Osienski [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Sen. Gerald Hocker [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (INSURANCE & TELECOMMUNICATIONS) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance & Telecommunications Committee in Senate |
2015-06-18 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-10 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2015-06-09 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |