DE HB166 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-13 - Reported Out of Committee (APPROPRIATIONS) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-13 - Reported Out of Committee (APPROPRIATIONS) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill exempts the half of the State realty transfer tax for first-time home buyers. This bill also allows the Department of Finance to adopt rules and regulations for an affidavit to state the names and professional license number of the real estate brokers, salespersons, or other licensed professional receiving commission money. This will enhance the ability of the Department of Finance to collect income taxes due on the commission money, particularly from non-residents.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Realty Transfer Tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (APPROPRIATIONS) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2011-06-21 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2011-06-08 | Reported Out of Committee (REVENUE & FINANCE) in House with 2 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |
2011-06-07 | Introduced in House and assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2011-06-07 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |