DE HB164 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Section 1 of the Act amends subsection (b)(1) of section 12A-103 of Title 6 to remove a reference to testamentary trusts that is either a redundancy or otherwise might conflict with new section 3550 of Title 12 (which is a part of the Act).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Titles 6 And 12 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Decedents Estates And Trusts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30 Signed by Governor
2021-06-22 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-06-16 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2021-06-08 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2021-06-08 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2021-06-03 Suspension of Rules in House
2021-05-19 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
2021-04-29 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback