DE HB164 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Passed on September 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill dissolves the Human Trafficking Coordinating Council and reestablishes it as the Human Trafficking Interagency Coordinating Council. The bill establishes the members of the Council and the chair and vice-chair. The bill also requires that a public awareness sign must be displayed at locations designated by the Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Human Trafficking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-14 Signed by Governor
2017-06-30 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-06-29 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-27 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-06-27 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
2017-06-27 Amendment HA 2 to HB 164 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-27 Amendment HA 1 to HB 164 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-23 Amendment HA 2 to HB 164 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
2017-06-08 Amendment HA 1 to HB 164 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-09 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback