DE HB163 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Currently there are 17 "check-boxes" on the Delaware personal income tax return where taxpayers may designate a portion of their refund or send additional money with their payment due to be credited as a charitable donation to various organizations. The number of organizations has continued to grow over the years without any charities being removed. As a result, a relatively stable total amount of donations is being spread across a larger number of causes, reducing the utility for any single charity and increasing the administrative burden on the Division of Revenue. This bill eliminates the two lowest grossing charitable funds - for the US Olympic Committee and for the Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Trust Fund, and replaces them with Funds for the Beau Biden Foundation for the Protection of Children and the United Way of Delaware. It also adds a provision to the code capping the number of permissible charity check-offs on the return at 21.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Income Tax Return.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-07-12 Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
2017-06-29 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-29 Amendment HA 2 to HB 163 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-29 Amendment HA 1 to HB 163 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-29 Amendment HA 2 to HB 163 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
2017-06-14 Amendment HA 1 to HB 163 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-09 Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback