DE HB162 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

The 18-month recidivism rate among juveniles released from Delawares Level 4 and Level 5 juvenile detention facilities is over 80%. This Act creates a fund to allow the Department of Services for Children, Youth, and their Families to award competitive grants for the targeted provision of services that have been proven effective in helping juveniles avoid contact with the criminal justice system. This Act also allocates $500,000 for FY 2022 to the Fund for provision of cognitive behavioral therapy services and vocational training services. Finally, the bill updates outdated language.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Services For Youth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-08 Signed by Governor
2021-06-22 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-06-22 Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2021-06-17 Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
2021-06-17 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2021-06-10 Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
2021-06-10 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2021-06-04 Suspension of Rules in House
2021-06-04 Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2021-05-13 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2021-05-12 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2021-04-28 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback