DE HB161 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sections 1 and 2 of this bill require individual and group life insurers to provide notice of cancellation of life insurance coverage due to nonpayment of premiums and to retain proof of mailing of such notices for a one-year period. Sections 3 and 4 of this bill require individual, group and blanket health insurers to provide notice of cancellation or nonrenewal of health insurance coverage due to nonpayment of premiums and to retain proof of mailing of such notices for a one-year period. Sections 5 and 6 of this bill require casualty and property insurers to retain proof of mailing notices of cancellation and/or nonrenewal for a one-year period. Section 7 of this bill precludes an insurance carrier from refusing to renew a policy based on a combination of claims unless 3 or more claims occur within a 48 month period. Notices to be provided pursuant to this bill may be provided in electronic form, subject to the requirements of 18 Del. C. 107.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance Contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryon Short [D] | Sen. Brian Bushweller [D] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] |
Sen. David Sokola [D] | Sen. Robert Venables [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2014-06-26 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-26 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-26 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-24 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits |
2014-05-15 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2013-05-30 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |