DE HB16 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Amendment HA 2 to HB 16 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Amendment HA 2 to HB 16 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill adds the Department of Correction, Bureau of Prisons and Bureau of Community Corrections' vehicles to the list of "authorized emergency vehicles" identified in Chapter 41 of Title 21 that are afforded certain privileges when responding to an emergency.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Emergency Vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Rep. John Mitchell [D] | Rep. William Carson [D] |
Rep. Richard Collins [R] | Rep. Sherry Dorsey Walker [D] | Rep. Michael Ramone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 16 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-03-05 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2019-01-24 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 16 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-01-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2018-12-13 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |