DE HB159 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on September 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on September 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This act modifies the locations at which sheriffs sales may be conducted to provide the sheriffs with needed flexibility and to modernize the sheriffs sale process. The recent COVID-19 pandemic has revealed substantial inflexibility in 10 Del. C. § 4974 as currently adopted, forcing the sheriff of each of the three counties to either hold sheriffs sales outdoors, find non-governmental venues in which to hold sheriffs sales or cancel sheriffs sales. Additionally, the New Castle County Sheriff is considering using an online auction process to conduct sheriffs sales, as other counties throughout the United States have done, but § 4974 as currently adopted does not permit online sheriffs sales. Finally, this act removes uncertainty regarding the meaning of the term public building as currently used in § 4974 by adopting a definition that is consistent with the Delaware Supreme Courts definition of that term in Moore v. Wilmington Housing Authority, 619 A.2d 1166, 1174-75 (Del. 1993).
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Sales Of Real Estate Made By A Sheriff.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mitchell [D] | Sen. Nicole Poore [D] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Rep. Sherry Dorsey Walker [D] |
Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Sen. Kyle Gay [D] | Sen. Laura Sturgeon [D] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-17 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-17 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2021-06-17 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 159 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2021-06-14 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 159 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-05-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2021-04-27 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |