DE HB157 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
As more services move outside of hospital walls, it is necessary to clearly define the scope of services offered in outpatient settings. Citizens of Delaware cannot be expected to discern the differences in levels of care offered in outpatient facilities. The levels of care and scope of practice must be clearly defined so that citizens seek care at a facility offering the services needed. Current literature makes it clear that any freestanding emergency department must be required to meet the same standards as a hospital emergency department. This legislation will update the Delaware Code and provide a level of protection for the public that would seek services in a freestanding emergency department by clearly defining the scope of practice.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Freestanding Emergency Departments.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Matthews [D] | Sen. Bethany Hall-Long [D] | Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] | Rep. Richard Collins [R] |
Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Rep. Edward Osienski [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-24 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-24 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-06-24 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2015-06-10 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 10 On Its Merits |
2015-06-02 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |