DE HB156 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill updates requirements for handguns used for deer hunting by adding a range and limit to allowable handgun calibers to accommodate changing handgun availability while maintaining public safety and handgun hunting efficacy. This bill also allows for pistol caliber rifle hunting for deer. This bill also makes a technical adjustment to clarify that a handgun or a pistol caliber rifle can be used for deer hunting during any shotgun deer season.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Conservation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-06-28 Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-19 Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate
2018-06-19 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NO
2018-06-19 Amendment HA 4 to HB 156 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-06-19 Amendment HA 3 to HB 156 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-06-19 Amendment HA 2 to HB 156 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-06-19 Amendment HA 1 to HB 156 - Stricken in House
2017-06-13 Amendment HA 4 to HB 156 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-07 Amendment HA 3 to HB 156 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-18 Amendment HA 2 to HB 156 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-17 Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 11 On Its Merits
2017-05-11 Amendment HA 1 to HB 156 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-02 Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback