DE HB155 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-24 - Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-24 - Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill ensures that for a period of two (2) years beginning July 1, 2009, victims of childhood sexual assaults by adult public sector employees may bring actions. Additionally, in the future sovereign immunity is waived as to the State and its political subdivisions, including school districts, for sexual abuse of a minor by an adult.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Pleadings And Practice.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-17 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2009-05-13 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |