DE HB152 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
In 2014, the General Assembly created an ignition interlock device program under ยงยง 4177C and 4177G of Title 21 of the Delaware Code (IID program). The IID program provides individuals whose license or driving privileges have been revoked following a conviction for driving under the influence of alcohol or drugs the ability to drive during their revocation period while putting measures in place to protect the public.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Ignition Interlock Device Requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2020-01-21 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-11 | Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2019-06-11 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-11 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 152 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-06-11 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 152 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-05-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-13 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |