DE HB150 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act creates the Delaware African and Caribbean Affairs Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Commission On Delaware African And Caribbean Affairs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
2017-05-03 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2017-05-04 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-05-05 Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-05-18 Amendment SA 1 to HB 150 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-18 Amendment SA 1 to HB 150 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-05-18 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT
2017-05-18 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback