DE HB149 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act disqualifies an individual who obtained an overpayment of benefits through fraud from receiving future unemployment benefits until the total overpayment, penalties, and interest are repaid in full. This change does not apply to fraud overpayments established by final decision before the effective date of this Act. This Act also broadens the manner in which a notice of overpayment may be delivered and removes the 5 year deadline for filing actions to collect overpayments due to the Department. This Act takes effect 60 days after its enactment into law.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Recoupment Of Overpayment Of Benefits.
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Osienski [D] | Sen. Jack Walsh [D] | Rep. Sherry Dorsey Walker [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] |
Sen. Charles Paradee [D] | Sen. David Wilson [R] | Rep. Michael Ramone [R] | Rep. Lyndon Yearick [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-26 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-21 | Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate | |
2019-06-20 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-05-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-09 | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House |