DE HB148 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Currently if a municipality or other governmental unit employs a police officer who has within 2 years completed mandatory training while in the employ of another municipality or governmental unit, the new employer reimburses the prior employer. This act changes the reimbursement if the change of employment occurs within 4 years, and changes the yearly rate of reimbursement to reflect the new time period to $40,000 for one year, $30,000 for two years, $20,000 for three, and $10,000 for four years .

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Police Training Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-30 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2022-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2022-05-05 Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate
2022-05-05 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
2021-06-16 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2021-04-15 Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback