DE HB148 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act allows the Department of Labor ("Department") to deliver notice by methods other than through mail to reduce costs by using e-mail delivery for certain notices and makes technical corrections to conform existing law to the standards of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating The Delivery Of Notices By The Delaware Division Of Unemployment Compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-26 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 12 YES 9 NO | |
2019-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-21 | Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate | |
2019-06-20 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-05-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-09 | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House |