DE HB148 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-27 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-27 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would allow Delaware residents two new deductions from personal income tax. The first is a deduction from taxable income of up to $2,500 for contributions to a 529 College Savings Plan. The second is a deduction from taxable income of up to $2,500 for contributions to a 529A Savings Account a special account for meeting the needs of certain individuals with disabilities. Under this Act, a Delaware resident taxpayer would be eligible for the deduction regardless of whether they made a contribution to a 529 or 529A plan sponsored by the State of Delaware or another state or institution, so long as the plans met federal criterion.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To College Savings And Able Savings Accounts.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Paradee [D] | Sen. Nicole Poore [D] | Rep. Charles Potter [D] | Sen. Colin Bonini [R] |
Sen. Jack Walsh [D] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Rep. Ronald Gray [R] | Rep. Kevin Hensley [R] |
Rep. John Mitchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2017-06-21 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 148 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-01 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 148 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-05-03 | Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2017-04-26 | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |