DE HB146 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill will remove the requirement for signatures to be in pen and ink when provided for driver license, identification card, or registration application processes. Removing this provision enables the Division of Motor Vehicles to develop more efficient means of serving customers including expanding online services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Drivers License And Vehicle Registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-21 Signed by Governor
2017-06-30 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-09 Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate
2017-06-06 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-05-10 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2017-04-25 Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback